Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77219
Short Caption:REPUBLICAN ATTORNEYS GEN. ASS'N VS. DIST. CT. (LAS VEGAS METRO. POLICE DEP'T)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77511
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/22/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Colleen E. McCarty.
10/22/2018Petition/WritFiled Emergency Petition For Writ of Mandamus Pursuant To NRAP 21(A) And NRAP 27(E).18-41299
10/22/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix Volume 1.18-41319
10/23/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Real Party in Interest's Answer to the Petition for Writ due: October 25, 2018 by 9:30 a.m.18-41730
10/25/2018Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department's, Answer to Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus Pursuant to NRAP 21(a) and NRAP 27(e).18-42016
10/25/2018AppendixFiled Appendix of Real Party in Interest, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department.18-42018
10/25/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner Republican Attorneys General Association's Notice of Relevant Briefing.18-42171
10/29/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP18-KP/MG/JH.18-42256
11/27/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)18-905742
11/27/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)