Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77278
Short Caption:WHITE (JIMMY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C309883Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:CadishCase Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/24/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/31/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
10/31/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-42816
11/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC).18-905906
12/04/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC)18-907024
12/04/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 2. (SC)18-907025
12/06/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)18-907393
12/07/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 93-101 (SEALED). (SC)
01/09/2019OtherJustice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
01/24/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
03/08/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion Requesting a Certified Transcript of the Entire District Court Record. (SC).19-10488
03/15/2019Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Appellant's Document - "Exhibit 1 to Notice of Appeal". (SC)19-11545
03/15/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. No cause appearing, appellant's pro se motion for a certified copy of the record on appeal is denied. (SC)19-11695
04/23/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Affidavit - 5 Exhibits. (DETACHED EXHIBITS AND RETURNED UNFILED). (SC)19-17836
04/29/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant, who is proceeding in pro se, has filed an affidavit relating to the argument in his informal brief as well as five exhibits. The affidavit is treated as a supplement to the informal brief. However, as appellant may not file an appendix in this matter, the clerk shall detach the exhibits from the affidavit filed on April 23, 2019, and return them unfiled.19-18584
09/03/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record. Supplemental Record on Appeal due: 21 days. (SC).19-36754
09/17/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. De'Awna Takas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/17/17. (SC)19-38811
09/18/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 3. (SC)19-38963