Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 61775-COA
Short Caption:FRAZIER VS. DRAKECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):61775
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A587955Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/21/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/06/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
03/02/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. The clerk shall schedule this matter for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-900210
04/22/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, May 21, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-900476
05/08/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 15-900511
05/21/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. . Before the Court of Appeals - MG/JT/AS.
09/03/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Silver. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 64. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver.15-901034
09/28/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.