Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 59685-COA
Short Caption:MICHAELS VS. PENTAIR WATER POOL AND SPA, INC.Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):59685, 72161
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A587256Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/25/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
02/05/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. . The clerk of this court shall schedule this matter for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-900116
02/12/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, March 25, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-900128
03/11/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.15-900243
03/23/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. for Oral Argument.15-900315
03/24/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Formal Request to Photograph Court in Session (LV Review Journal)15-900319
03/25/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. . Before the Court of Appeals - MG/JT/AS.
10/01/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Vacated and remanded." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Tao, J. Majority: Tao/Gibbons. Silver, J., concurring. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 81. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver.15-901192
10/26/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-900151.)