Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 62792-COA
Short Caption:SANDERS VS. SEARS-PAGECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):62792
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A625736Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/25/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/07/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
02/05/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. . The clerk of this court shall schedule this matter for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-900118
02/12/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, March 25, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-900144
03/12/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 15-900245
03/13/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of JAVS Video Recording. The district court clerk shall, within five days from the date of this order, certify and transmit to this court the JAVS video recording(s). The district court clerk shall also deliver a copy of the recording to the court of appeals office on the 17th floor of the Regional Justice Center in Las Vegas. Fn1[Such certification may consist of an affidavit, declaration, affirmation, confirmation, or other appropriate testamentary statement verifying that the video recordings are true and correct copies of the video recordings of the proceedings.]15-900261
03/20/2015ExhibitReceived Exhibits (copies). JAVs Video Recording.
03/25/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. . Before the Court of Appeals - MG/JT/AS.
07/16/2015Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed/Remanded." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Gibbons/Tao. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 50. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver.15-900780
07/16/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Modifying Opinion. We direct the clerk of this court to modify the opinion filed on July 16, 2015, by deleting the word "12" from the last sentence of the second full paragraph following the heading "Sanders' challenge to Juror 9 for cause".15-900785
07/22/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. (Letter dated July 21, 2015) Nos. 63284/61059/64623/59638/60527/63076/63683/62792. (Letter entered in 63284 as document no. 15-22234)
08/10/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
11/17/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. (dated 11/10/15) to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 65429/64539/62792/62059 (Letter entered in 64539 as document no. 15-901390)