Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64215-COA
Short Caption:GUITRON (MIGUEL) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):64215, 72572
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C287119Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/25/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
02/05/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. . The clerk of this court shall schedule this matter for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-900117
02/06/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of Exhibits. DC Clerk: Exhibits due 15 days.15-900124
02/12/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, March 25, 2015, at 3:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-900146
02/18/2015ExhibitReceived Exhibits (copies). Certified Copy of State's Exhibit #3, 4 & 5.
03/12/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 15-900248
03/25/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. . Before the Court of Appeals. MG/JT/AS.
05/21/2015Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Silver, Abbi. Majority: Silver/Gibbons/Tao. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 27. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver.15-900549
06/15/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.