Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64539-COA
Short Caption:GONZALES (NOEL) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):64539
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C286004Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/25/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
02/06/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. . The clerk shall schedule this matter for oral argument on the next available calendar.15-900122
02/12/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, March 25, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-900145
03/12/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 15-900247
03/25/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. . Before the Court of Appeals. MG/JT/AS.
07/02/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Gibbons, C.J., Tao and Silver, JJ. Author: Tao, J. 130 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 49. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver.15-900710
07/27/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
11/17/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. (dated 11/10/15) to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 65429/64539/62792/6205915-901390