Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 64881-COA
Short Caption:CASSINELLI (DOMINIC) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):64881
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - CR 13-11600Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/22/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/27/2014Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed District Court Order Adjudicating Motion for Election of Treatment filed in District Court on June 20, 2014.14-21194
01/07/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
03/17/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. . Oral argument shall be held on Wednesday, April 22, 2015, at the hour of 3:00 p.m. in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.15-900295
04/03/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 15-900348
04/20/2015Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Rescheduling Oral Argument. This matter was previously scheduled for oral argument before the court of appeals on Wednesday, April 22, 2015, at the hour of 3:00 p.m. in Carson City. The time for argument has been rescheduled. Oral argument will be held on Wednesday, April 22, 2015, at the hour of 2:00 p.m. in Carson City. The argument will be limited to 30 minutes.15-900466
04/22/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. . Before the Court of Appeals - MG/JT/AS.
08/27/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, vacated in part and remanded." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Gibbons. Tao, J., concurring. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 62. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver.15-900976
09/21/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-900151.)