Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 66428-COA
Short Caption:MITCHELL (DEANGELO) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):37531, 37553, 40150, 42638, 44093, 46213, 46887, 51332, 53085, 62069, 62372, 66079, 66080, 66428, 66773, 66773-COA, 69542, 70017, 70017-COA, 76899, 82127, 82127-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/05/2015How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/07/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
02/05/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/AS15-900115
02/05/2015Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
02/24/2015Post-Judgment PetitionReceived Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Petition for En Banc Reconsideration [NRAP 40].15-900162
04/14/2015Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).15-900381
05/11/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.