Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 63737-COA
Short Caption:JOHNSON (TABUTA) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):63737, 71064
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C287460Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/23/2015How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/20/2015MotionFiled Response to Order. Filed Tabuta Johnson's Statement Regarding Assignment to Court of Appeals.15-01951
01/23/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
01/23/2015Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
07/30/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Tao, J. Majority: Tao/Gibbons/Silver. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 58. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver.15-900827
08/24/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-900151.)