Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65273-COA
Short Caption:MERLINO (CARRIE) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):65273, 67260, 67260-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C282844Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/21/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/03/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
03/02/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order. District Court State's Exhibit 25 due: 10 days.15-900211
03/12/2015ExhibitReceived Exhibit (original). Original State's Exhibit(s) 25.
04/22/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, May 21, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-900477
04/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. . Oral Argument shall be held on Thursday, May 21, 2015, at the hour of 11:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.15-900478
05/08/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 15-900512
05/21/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. . Before the Court of Appeals - MG/JT/AS.
05/22/2015BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Post-Argument Supplemental Point and Authorities (via Fax)15-900553
05/22/2015BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Appellant's Supplemental Authority.15-900557
09/10/2015Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Vacated in part." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Tao, J. Majority: Tao/Gibbons/Silver. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 65. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver.15-901058
10/05/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
02/10/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. dated February 8, 2016, to publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 62059/(61103/61640)/62745/63737/64881/65273/64214/61131/(60673/61390)/62061/64130/64484/65064/65632/66346/59685/(61305/61871)/(61324/63258)/65335/54389/64569 (Letter entered in 62059 as document no. 16-900151.)