Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 65419-COA
Short Caption:TOM VS. INNOVATIVE HOME SYS., LLC C/W 66006Court:Court of Appeals
Consolidated:65419-COA*, 66006-COARelated Case(s):65419, 66006, 66006-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A680766Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/24/2015How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/15/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
07/22/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. . The clerk shall schedule this matter for oral argument on the next available calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 65419/66006.15-900805
08/05/2015Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation (Pezzillo Lloyd is now Howard & Howard). Nos. 65419/66006.15-900875
08/11/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, September 24, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.15-900905
09/10/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 15-901069
09/24/2015Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. . Before the Court of Appeals - MG/JT/AS.
03/10/2016Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed in part, vacated in part, and remanded." Before Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Silver. Concurrence: Tao. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 15. Court of Appeals/Gibbons/Tao/Silver. Nos. 65419/6600616-900278
03/31/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. -Innovative Home Systems, Inc.'s Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 65419/66006.16-900374
03/31/2016Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. -$150.00 from Snell & Wilmer L.L.P. Check No. 16308. Nos. 65419/66006.
05/10/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Rehearing/En Banc Reconsideration. . Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Answer due: 15 days. Nos. 65419/66006.16-900555
05/27/2016Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant Timothy Tom's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 65419/66006.16-900653
06/29/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Reply. Respondent shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply in support of the petition for rehearing. Nos. 65419/66006.16-900781
08/04/2016Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. . "We deny the rehearing petition." NRAP 40(c). TAO, J. concurring. Nos. 65419/66006.16-900903
08/29/2016Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
08/29/2016Case Status UpdateCase Closed.