Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 67260-COA & 67260
Short Caption:BYRD (DENNIS) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65273, 65273-COA, 67260
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C282844Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/05/2015How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/22/2015Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
01/22/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (Filed by the Dist. Ct. Clerk).15-02325
02/09/2015Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.15-04235
02/12/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.15-04708
05/29/2015MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Expand Time to Opening Brief.15-16455
06/08/2015Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 21, 2015.15-17313
07/22/2015BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.15-22120
07/22/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I.15-22121
07/22/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II.15-22122
07/22/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume III.15-22123
07/22/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume IV.15-22124
07/22/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume V.15-22125
07/22/2015AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume VI.15-22126
08/20/2015BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.15-25199
10/05/2015Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed.
10/21/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.15-32025
10/21/2015Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
11/05/2015Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
12/18/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/AS
12/18/2015Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/AS15-901607
01/15/2016Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
01/15/2016RemittiturIssued Remittitur.16-01513
01/15/2016Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/15/2016Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
01/15/2016Case Status UpdateCase Closed.
01/28/2016RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 21, 2016.16-01513