Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70023-COA
Short Caption:ABARRA VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):62107, 70023
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 12OC001741BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/29/2016How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/2016Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
08/29/2016Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
09/02/2016Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries. 16-901032
09/20/2016Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/AS16-901106
10/18/2016Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
10/18/2016Case Status UpdateCase Closed.