Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 69410-COA
Short Caption:DEZZANI VS. KERN & ASSOC.'S, LTD. C/W 69896Court:Court of Appeals
Consolidated:69410-COA*, 69896-COARelated Case(s):69410, 69896, 69896-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1500826Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/08/2016How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Filed Proper Person Appellant's in Pro Per Request for Oral Argument.16-27696
09/08/2016Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
09/08/2016Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
09/22/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Consolidating Appeals and Granting Motion to File Reply Brief. Reply Brief (No. 69896) due: 20 days. fn1[We defer ruling on all other requests for relief currently pending in these appeals.]16-901134
10/07/2016MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellants' Request for 10 Days Extension to File Reply Brief. Nos. 69410/69896.16-901180
10/12/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. -Reply Brief due: October 24, 2016. fn1[Because the addition of ten days would cause appellants' reply to be due on a non-judical day, we extend the reply period to the end of the next judicial day.] fn2[We defer ruling on appellants' September 7, 2016, request for oral argument.] Nos. 69410/69896.16-901192
10/26/2016BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. - Reply Brief in Docket No. 69896. Nos. 69410/69896.16-901296
11/16/2016Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Order Affirming in Part and Reversing in Part. "We affirm the district court's dismissal of appellants' complaint. We reverse the award of fees and costs." Fn5[We also deny appellants' September 7, 2016, motion requesting oral argument in this matter.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/AS Nos. 69410/6989616-901357
12/05/2016Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
12/05/2016Case Status UpdateCase Closed.