Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70626-COA
Short Caption:NASBY (BRENDAN) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):35319, 47130, 58579, 67476, 67580, 67704, 68039, 70626, 73412, 73412-COA, 80443, 80443-COA, 81484, 81484-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154293Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/16/2017How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/16/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
02/16/2017Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
02/24/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel.17-900361
03/24/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. . On February 15, 2017, the Nevada Supreme Court denied appellant’s motion for the appointment of counsel. This appeal was transferred to this court on February 16, 2017. On February 24, 2017, appellant filed a motion to reconsider the order denying his motion for the appointment of counsel. We elect to treat the motion for reconsideration as a renewed motion for the appointment of counsel. We deny the motion.17-900558
04/24/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Request for Submission of Motion.17-900788
04/28/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 27, 2017, appellant filed a motion requesting submission of his motion requesting submission of his motion to reconsider the order denying his motion for the appointment of counsel. Because the court denied his motion for reconsideration on March 24, 2017, no action will be taken on the instant motion requesting submission.17-900845
07/12/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG.17-901396
08/02/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. NRAP Rule 40 Petition for Rehearing.17-901571
09/15/2017Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).17-901924
09/28/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
09/28/2017Case Status UpdateCase Closed.