Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71857-COA
Short Caption:RIMER (STANLEY) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):54555, 57454, 58711, 58896, 65727, 65728, 69326, 69510, 70352, 71451, 71855, 71856, 71857, 73187, 73693, 73693-COA, 73781, 73781-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C246300Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/16/2017How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/16/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
06/16/2017Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
07/19/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion to Recall Transfer Order to Court of Appeals, Back into Supreme Court State of Nevada Due to State Judicial Unlawful Conversion of Appellant's NRS 34.360 Habeas Corpus, Suspension of the Writ by the Very Deferndant(s) - Respondent(s) Named in the Writ Herndon, Wolfson, Parraguirre, Douglas, Hardesty, with Objection to the Transfer and Participation to Overthrow the Function of NRS 34.360.17-901486
07/21/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On July 19, 2017, appellant filed a motion to recall the transfer and have the matter heard by the Nevada Supreme Court. The motion is denied.17-901517
08/03/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion to Appoint Counsel.17-901575
08/10/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Groud to Habeas Appeal Ground No. 19, as to the Nevada Supreme Court Affir,ation Standing on an Executive Type Action in the Guise of a Lawful Judicial Ruling.17-901621
08/10/2017Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. "Supplemental Ground No.-19 to Habeas Appeal Regarding the Executive Actions Imposed by the Nevada Courts (the State District Court and Nevada Supreme Courts) in the Guise of Judicial Acts Tied to Denial of Habeas Corpus and/or Direct Review - Affirmation of Conviction.
08/25/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Ground Argument -N- (20) to Appellant's Habeas Appeal Enclosed Here with Regarding U.S. Constitution 5th Amendment Claim as to Deprivation of Fair Trial Caused by Ineffective Assistance of Counsel Violating U.S.C. 6th Amendment.17-901747
10/26/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion to Appoint Counsel and Evidentiary Hearing.17-902258
11/15/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. . "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2[On August 3, 2017, and October 26, 2017, Rimer filed motions for the appointment of counsel. We deny these motions. We have reviewed all documents Rimer has filed in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG17-902375
12/07/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. - Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: December 18, 2017.17-902564
12/08/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Develop Dispositive Arguments for Reconsideration, or in the Alternative, Review by the Nevada Supreme Court Via En Banc Panel.17-902566
12/29/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. in Part. Petition for Rehearing due: February 16, 2018.17-902810
02/15/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. to Exceed Page Limitation for Petition for En Banc Panel Reconsideraton and Request for Evidentiary Hearing and Appointment of Counsel.18-900311
02/15/2018Post-Judgment PetitionReceived Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Petitoin for En Banc Panel Reconsideration Pursuant to NRAP 40 A, and Request for Evidentiary Hearing with Attachments. (FILED PETITION FOR REHEARING AND RETURNED "ATTACHMENT A" ATTACHED TO PETITION FOR REHEARING, UNFILED PER 03/14/18 ORDER.)
03/14/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. In Part. The clerk of this court shall file the petition for regearing received on February 15, 2018. However, we dey the motion for an evidentiary hearing, motion for appointment of counsel, and motion for leave to file an attachment to the petition for rehearing. The clerk of this court shall return "Attachment A" that was received on February 15, 2018.18-900436
03/14/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. - Appellant's Petition for En Banc Panel Reconsideration Pursuant to NRAP - Rule 40A, and Request for Evidentiary Hearing.18-900437
04/20/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. . "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).18-900811
05/07/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
05/07/2018Case Status UpdateCase Closed.