Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 72352-COA & 72352
Short Caption:VICKERS (TRACEY) VS. DIRECTORCourt:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Related Case(s):72352
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 16EW001391BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/23/2017How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/13/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
02/13/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-05013
04/21/2017BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief.17-13319
04/28/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record on appeal due: 30 days.17-14145
05/03/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.17-14695
05/25/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 1.
06/13/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Change of Address (Tracey Vickers).17-19580
06/20/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
08/10/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Change of Address (Tracy Vickers).17-26733
08/23/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.17-28301
08/23/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
08/23/2017Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
08/30/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries. 17-901791
08/08/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice. - Notice of Change of Address.18-901741
11/21/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Silver/Tao/Gibbons. Majority: Silver/Tao/Gibbons.134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 91. COA18-905209
11/21/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Silver/Tao/Gibbons. Majority: Silver/Tao/Gibbons.134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 91. COA (SC)
12/17/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA).
12/17/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC).
12/17/2018Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA).
12/17/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).18-909084
12/17/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
12/31/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 18, 2018. (SC)18-909084