Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71516-COA
Short Caption:BOWSER (TERRENCE) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):50851, 71516
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C211162Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/30/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/30/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
09/22/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-901967
09/27/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Thursday, November 30, 2017, at 10 a.m. for 30 minutes.17-901997
11/13/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 17-902331
11/30/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court of Appeals - AS/JT/MG
12/15/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. . "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Tao, J., concurring. Silver, C.J. concurring in part and dissenting in part. Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG17-902680
12/22/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
12/22/2017Case Status UpdateCase Closed.