Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71727-COA
Short Caption:EPPS (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):71727, 81372, 81372-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C285595Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/09/2017How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/12/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
11/09/2017Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
03/14/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. . "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG18-900466
04/06/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. - Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.18-900651
05/18/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. . "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).18-901089
06/06/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
06/06/2018Case Status UpdateCase Closed.