Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74070-COA
Short Caption:MALONE (DOMONIC) VS. THE EIGHTH JUD. DIST. CT.Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):58101, 61006, 73000, 74070, 74859, 74859-COA, 75310, 75310-COA, 80492, 80493
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C224572Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/12/2017How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/26/2017Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus.17-32738
10/12/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
10/12/2017Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
12/15/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Case No. 74070 With Case No. 73000.17-902682
12/28/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. . "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [In light of this order, we deny petitioner's motion to consolidate this matter with the appeal in Docket No. 73000.] Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG.17-902769
01/23/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
01/23/2018Case Status UpdateCase Closed.