Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72879-COA
Short Caption:DECHAMBEAU VS. BALKENBUSH, ESQ.Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):64463, 72004, 72004-COA, 72879
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1200571Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/20/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/21/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
01/23/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. - Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.18-900095
01/24/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, March 20, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City, NV.18-900104
02/05/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 18-900161
03/06/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 18-900401
03/20/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. . Before the Court of Appeals- AS/JT/MG
09/27/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Silver/Tao/Gibbons. Author: Tao, J.. Majority: Tao/Gibbons. Concurrence: Silver, C.J. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 75. Court of Appeals/Silver/Tao/Gibbons.18-902244
10/09/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. - Appellants' Petition for Rehearing Within Appellate Court.Y18-902357
10/09/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. . $150.00 from Charles R. Kozak. Check No. 2848.