Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 70583-COA
Short Caption:WYNN LAS VEGAS, LLC VS. O'CONNELLCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):70583, 71789, 71789-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A655992Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/12/2018How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/18/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
03/12/2018Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
03/15/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. . Voluntary Disclosure. For the record, I wish to disclose that I will be participating in an upcoming spring league tennis team with counsel for appellant, attorney Brian Nettles. I do not believe this situation mandates my disqualification from this matter. However, I make this disclosure so that any party who wishes to request my recusal may do so. Any such request must be made in writing and filed in clerk’s office within 10 days. fn1 [Any such response must be filed by faxing a copy of the response within 10 days, with the original version submitted by mail. The fax number for the clerk’s office is 775-684-1601.] Nos. 70583/71789.18-900512
08/30/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We AFFIRM the judgment of the district court." Fn1[This appeal was consolidated with the appeal in Docket No. 71789 prior to briefing. We now deconsolidate these appeals for the purposes of disposition only. Accordingly. This order will only be filed within this appeal. The disposition for the appeal in Docket No. 71789 will be entered separately, within the appeal. Otherwise, the appeals remain consolidated for all other appellate purposes.] Tao, J., dissenting.Court of Appeals-MG/AS/JT18-901953
09/14/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
09/14/2018Case Status UpdateCase Closed.