Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73698-COA
Short Caption:DOOLIN (GLENN) VS. STATE, DEPT. OF CORR.Court:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):72189, 72189-COA, 73698
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A745766Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/01/2018How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/01/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
03/01/2018Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
03/14/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. (Jessica Perlick, Deputy Attorney General for Respondents).18-900497
06/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Response. Respondent's Response to Doolin's Opening Brief due: 30 days.18-901220
07/10/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Response due: July 23, 2018.18-901469
07/25/2018MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. - Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Court Order.18-901597
07/30/2018BriefReceived Answering Brief. . Respondent's Answering Brief (Response). (FILED PER ORDER 8/8/18).
07/30/2018AppendixReceived Appendix to Answering Brief. (FILED PER ORDER 8/8/18).
08/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. . The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief and appendix received on July 30, 2018.18-901737
08/08/2018BriefFiled Answering Brief. - Respondent's Answering Brief.18-901738
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 18-901739
08/23/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. - Appellant's Proper Person Reply Brief (N.R.A.P. 28(c)).18-901883
12/13/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Silver/Tao/Gibbons. Majority: Silver/Tao/Gibbons. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 98. COA18-908479
01/07/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
01/07/2019Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)