Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 71941-COA
Short Caption:ROSE, LLC VS. TREASURE ISLAND, LLCCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):71941
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A719105Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/18/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/05/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
06/06/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.18-901207
07/30/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, September 18, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.18-901662
09/04/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 18-902000
09/18/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court of Appeals, Chief Judge Silver presiding.
06/06/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. Author: Tao, J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 19. (COA)19-24492
06/24/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Petitition for Rehearing. (COA)19-27188
06/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until August 8, 2019, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. If no petition for rehearing is filed by August 8, 2019, the clerk shall transfer this appeal back to the Supreme Court and issue the remittitur forthwith. (SC)19-27474
08/08/2019MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. (COA)Y19-33384