Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 39274
Short Caption:FRANCHISE TAX BD. OF CALIFORNIA VS. DIST. CT.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):35549, 36390, 39312, 47141, 53264, 80884
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A382999Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/04/2002OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Attorney Thomas R.C. Wilson, II.
03/04/2002Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from McDonald Carano Wilson McCune Bergin Frankovich & Hicks LLP--check no. 37490.
03/04/2002Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Franchise Tax Board of the State of California's Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, for Writ of Prohibition re: Protective Order. (Confidential Information Filed under Seal.)02-03920
03/04/2002AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Franchise Tax Board of the State of California's Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, for Writ of Prohibition re: Protective Order. (Confidential Information Filed under Seal.)02-03923
04/04/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition and Dismissing Appeal. We deny the petition in Docket No. 39274. As we lack jurisdiction, we dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 39312. fn3[The Honorable Nancy Becker, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in this matter.] EN BANC-WM/CY/MS/DA/RR/ML02-05994
04/30/2002RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.02-06515
04/30/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/30/2002Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Thomas R.C. Wilson. The U.S. Supreme Court has granted FTB's Petition for a Writ of Certiorari. He requests a complete copy of all files in nos. 35549, 36390, 39274 and 39312. [02-18691]
11/07/2002Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. (via fax) from law firm of Bernhard, Bradley & Johnson, Chtd. They are requesting copies of all documents in 35549, 36390, 39274 and 39312. [02-19212]
11/15/2002Other Other. Provided copies of all documents from docket numbers 35549, 36390, 39274 and 39312 to McDonald Carano law firm and Bernhard, Bradley & Johnson law firm. Nos. 35549/36390/ 39274/39312
11/18/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of ceritorari to the Supreme Court of Nevada is granted (filed October 15, 2002). Nos. 35549/36390/39274/39312 (02-19798)
01/07/2003Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from U.S. Supreme Court requesting transmission of certified copies of the entire record to their office. Nos. 35549/36390/39274/39312
01/09/2003Other Other. Transmitted to United States Supreme Court (via Federal Express) certified copies of entire record of proceedings in Nos. 35549, 36390, 39274, 39312 (Volumes 1 through 13 and nine white binders containing exhibits).
05/28/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Received of William K. Suter, Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States, a certified copy of the mandate and a copy of the opinion issued in this matter. Nos. 35549/36390/39274/39312.03-08926