Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73412-COA
Short Caption:NASBY (BRENDAN) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):35319, 47130, 58579, 67476, 67580, 67704, 68039, 70626, 70626-COA, 73412, 73414, 80443, 80443-COA, 81484, 81484-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154293Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/16/2018How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/12/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
04/16/2018Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
08/14/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. . "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG18-901784
09/06/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. .18-902014
10/22/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. . "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).18-902513
11/16/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
11/16/2018Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)