Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 73412-COA & 73412
Short Caption:NASBY (BRENDAN) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Related Case(s):35319, 47130, 58579, 67476, 67580, 67704, 68039, 70626, 70626-COA, 73412, 73414, 80443, 80443-COA, 81484, 81484-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154293Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/16/2018How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/07/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
07/07/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-22610
09/01/2017OtherJustice Mark Gibbons disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings.
09/15/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal.17-31211
10/10/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-13 (via FTP).17-34496
10/17/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 1017-1022 (SEALED).
10/17/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 1163-1166, 1527-1530, 1769-1779, 1789, 1810-1813, 2053, 2369-2370 (SEALED).
01/22/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief.18-02755
03/07/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
04/12/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.18-14063
04/12/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
04/16/2018Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
08/14/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG
08/14/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. . "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG18-901784
09/06/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. .18-902014
10/22/2018Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. . "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c).18-902513
11/16/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
11/16/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
11/16/2018Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)
11/16/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)18-904554
11/16/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
11/30/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 20, 2018. (SC)18-904554