Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 73048-COA & 73048
Short Caption:NATKO (HELEN) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Related Case(s):73048
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C313574Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/27/2018 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Courtroom
Submission Date:11/27/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/16/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
05/16/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-16348
05/31/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-18062
06/05/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has not yet been sentenced. Although the district court currently retains jurisdiction, upon the entry of the judgment of conviction, appellate jurisdiction will be vested in this court. Upon entry of the judgment of conviction, the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment to the clerk of this court.17-18594
06/06/2017Transcript RequestFiled Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/10/17, 05/03/17. To Court Reporter: Christine Erickson (Notice of Cancellation of Request for Rough Draft Transcript and Amended Request for Transcript).17-18774
07/21/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Christine Erickson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/10/17 & 05/03/17.17-24222
08/11/2017Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 08/10/17. Judgment of Conviction (Response to Supreme Court Order dated 06/05/2017 - C313574).17-26948
08/16/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days.17-27472
12/13/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days (Routing statement is required. NRAP 28(a)(5), Certificate of compliance does not comply with NRAP 32(a)(9)).17-42991
12/13/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix - Volume I.17-42998
12/13/2017AppendixFiled Amended Appellant's Appendix - Volume I.17-43051
12/14/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-43290
01/12/2018MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief.18-01906
01/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: March 19, 2018.18-03564
03/19/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-10615
03/29/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-12059
03/29/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
04/19/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.18-15024
04/19/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
09/10/2018Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
09/17/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. . Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. The court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.18-902114
10/11/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, November 28, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.18-902392
11/13/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Rescheduling Oral Argument. Due to a scheduling conflict, the oral argument for this case, currently set for Wednesday, November 28, 2018, will have to be rescheduled. Accordingly, oral argument for this matter will now be held on Tuesday, November 27, 2018, at 10:30 a.m., in Las Vegas. (COA).18-903805
11/13/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (COA)18-903818
11/26/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Correction in Opening and Reply Briefs. (Via Fax)(COA)18-905442
11/27/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG (SC)
12/20/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Silver/Tao/Gibbons. Author: Silver, C.J. Majority: Silver/Gibbons. Tao, J., dissenting. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 103. COA18-909620
12/20/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Silver/Tao/Gibbons. Author: Silver, C.J. Majority: Silver/Gibbons. Tao, J., dissenting. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 103. COA (SC)
01/07/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
01/07/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
01/07/2019Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)
01/07/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Review. (SC)19-00875
01/11/2019OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
02/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Review. Appellant's Answer due: 15 days. (SC).19-08729
03/13/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Response to Petition for Review. (SC)19-11082
03/14/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Amended Response to Petition for Review. (SC)19-11259
09/05/2019Post-Judgment Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." NRAP 40 B. fn1[Chief Justice Mark Gibbons did not participate in the decision of this matter. Justice Abbi Silver voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] (SC)19-37073
09/30/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).19-40432
09/30/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
10/11/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 7, 2019. (SC)19-40432