Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73693-COA
Short Caption:RIMER (STANLEY) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):54555, 57454, 58711, 58896, 65727, 65728, 66170, 67347, 69326, 69510, 70352, 71451, 71855, 71856, 71857, 71857-COA, 73187, 73693, 73781, 73781-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C246300Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/17/2018How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/17/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
05/17/2018Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
08/07/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice. - Affidavit Setting Forth Cause for Attachment of Bond(s) and Support for Formal Pleadings for Impeachment Proceedings Based on State Actor Breach of Oath or Affirmation Committing Perjury in Conflict with Title 23, NRS Chapt. 282 Det Seq., and Nev. Const. Art. 7 sect. 2, sect. 3; Art 15 sect 2; also U.S. Const. Art 6, CLS. 3, For Malfeasane in Office Pursuant to NRS 283.300; NRS 283.430; NRS 283.440, Thus Failing and Refusing to Give Effect to All Binding Constituional Rights, State and Federal law, Due Process, and the Equal Protection of Law.18-901732
08/14/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. . "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG18-901798
08/27/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. . Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: September 18, 2018.18-901932
09/17/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
09/17/2018Case Status UpdateCase Closed.