Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 74859-COA & 74859
Short Caption:MALONE (DOMONIC) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Related Case(s):58101, 61006, 73000, 74070, 74070-COA, 74859, 75310, 75310-COA, 80492, 80493
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C224572Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/31/2018How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/12/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
01/12/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-01776
02/01/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Full Brief. (DETACH OPENING BRIEF AND FILED PER ORDER FILED 3/7/18; DETACHED EXHIBITS FROM OPENING BRIEF AND RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER FILED 3/7/18)18-04513
03/07/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. The clerk of this court shall detach the pro se opening brief from the motion filed on February 1, 2018. we elect to construe the document as an informal brief. The clerk of this court shall file the brief separately, but detach the exhibits from the brief and return them, unfiled.18-08975
03/07/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-08976
03/23/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-25 (Via FTP).18-11469
03/23/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 26-50 (Via FTP).18-11470
03/23/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 51-74 (Via FTP).18-11471
03/28/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (PSI) Pages 9475-9485 (SEALED).
03/28/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 43-50, 1750-1757, 1759-1760, 1787-1788, 1830, 1880-1882, 2116-2121, 2147-2149, 2170-2172, 2174-2179, 2182-2184, 2711-2715, 2720, 2919-2924, 9599-9600, 9601-9605, 11587-11600, 11601-11745 (SEALED).
04/20/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
05/31/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals.18-20734
05/31/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
05/31/2018Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
08/14/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG
08/14/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. . "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG18-901825
09/11/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
09/11/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-35485
09/11/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/11/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court.
09/11/2018Case Status UpdateCase Closed.
09/21/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 14, 2018.18-35485