Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75050-COA
Short Caption:CRAIG VS. DONNELLYCourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):75050
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PI 16-1044Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/07/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
06/11/2018OtherReturned Unfiled Document. -Proper Person Letter Sent to us in Error.18-901231
06/13/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice. Regarding Recent Event.18-901287
06/20/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice. - Grievance.18-901328
07/19/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. - Appoint an Attorney.18-901548
08/27/2018Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. - Letter Regarding Case.18-901939
11/14/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting to "be appointed an attorney." No sufficient cause appearing, we deny the motion. (COA)18-904168
11/26/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Try to Settle or Resolve on Personal Grounds of Stress. (COA)18-905624
11/26/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's "Motion Asking to Deny Dismissal on There Own Admission of A Problem with My Med's." (COA)18-905633
12/14/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Response. Respondents' response shall not exceed ten pages plus the attorney's certificate required by NRAP 28.2. The response need not include the table of contents and table of cases, statutes, and other authorities required by NRAP 28(b). (COA)18-908861
01/15/2019BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (COA)19-02231
01/29/2019Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Appellant's Document - "Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss". (COA)19-04552
02/28/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Fn3[In light of our resolution of this case, we deny all other requests for relief currently pending in this matter.] Before: Douglas/Tao/Gibbons. Majority: Douglas/Tao/Gibbons. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 6. COA (COA)19-09141