Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 74419-COA & 74419
Short Caption:GRIMES (BENNETT) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Related Case(s):62835, 67598, 67741, 74419, 81042, 81042-COA, 81335, 81531, 81697, 81697-COA, 83088, 83088-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C276163Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Transferred to Supreme Court
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/28/2018How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/09/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
11/09/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-38750
11/21/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Appointed Counsel. (Attorney Jamie Resch for appellant)17-40220
11/21/2017MotionFiled Motion to Set Briefing Schedule.17-40221
11/28/2017Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Findings in Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 11/20/17.17-40891
11/30/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Setting Briefing Schedule. Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement due: 20 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days. fn1[The motion to set briefing schedule filed on November 1, 2017, is denied as moot.]17-41291
12/04/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/24/17, 10/05/17. To Court Reporter: Kristine Santi.17-41540
12/04/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-41541
01/22/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kristine Santi stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/24/17 and 10/5/17.18-02759
03/13/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-09885
03/13/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1.18-09891
03/13/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2.18-09892
03/13/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3.18-09893
03/13/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4.18-09894
03/13/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5.18-09900
03/13/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6.18-09901
04/10/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-13763
05/03/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-16746
05/03/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
06/28/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals.18-24666
06/28/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court.
06/28/2018Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
12/19/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG (COA)18-909557
12/19/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG (COA
01/02/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
01/02/2019Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)
01/02/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
01/02/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Review by the Nevada Supreme Court. (SC)19-00157
01/02/2019Filing FeeRehearing Filing Fee Waived. (SC)
01/07/2019OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
02/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Review. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days. (SC).19-08731
03/07/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Answer to Petition for Review. (SC).19-10337
04/05/2019Post-Judgment Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Review "Review denied." NRAP 40B. fn1 [Chief Justice Mark Gibbons did not participate in the decision of this matter. Justice Abbi Silver voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] (SC).19-14812
04/30/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-18943
04/30/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
05/15/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 3, 2019. (SC)19-18943