Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77410
Short Caption:O'DONNELL (THOMAS) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):74671
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A759974Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/16/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/15/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
11/15/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)18-904360
12/04/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA)18-906963
12/06/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's "Expidited Motion for Bail." (SC)18-907406
12/11/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Supplemental Motion - Due Process Failure. (SC)18-907984
12/11/2018Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Letter - If Appeal has been Accepted in a Expedited Condition. (SC)18-907998
12/14/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Enter Written Judgment or Order. District Court Order due: 60 days. fn1 [We defer ruling on the pro se motions filed December 6 and 11, 2018, pending determination of this court's jurisdiction.] (SC).18-908795
01/03/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's "Emergency Request Petition for Relief by Expedited Bail Hearing 14th Amendment - Due Process."19-00444
01/09/2019Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 01/07/19. Decision and Order. (SC)19-01304
01/16/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion for bail pending appeal. The motion for bail pending appeal is denied. The resolution of this appeal shall be expedited to the extent that this court's docket will allow. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-02572
01/24/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1. (SC)19-03873
01/24/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 2. (SC)19-03874
01/24/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 3. (SC)19-03875
04/11/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Change of Address. (SC)19-16021
05/13/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: May 30, 2019. (SC).19-20767
05/14/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Katrina A. Samuels for Respondents). (SC)19-21005
05/30/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Brief - "Motion Brief to State's Response and Failure to Comply with the ADA Act" (Appellant's Opening Brief). (SC)19-23596
07/16/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC).