Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77491
Short Caption:SEVRENCE (EDWIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):45857, 52130, 52469, 55004, 61752, 67153, 70033
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR042074Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/05/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/27/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
11/27/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)18-905787
12/26/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)18-910280
01/08/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-25 (Via FTP). (SC)19-01153
01/10/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 26 (SEALED). (SC)
01/10/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Presentence Investigation Report (SEALED). (SC)
03/12/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Include Justice Court Record in Appellant's Post Conviction Appeal. (SC)19-10919
03/21/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed, in pro se, a request that the record from his justice court case be included in the record on appeal in the instant appeal. It does not appear that the justice court record was considered by the district court in the underlying proceedings. It thus appears that this court may not consider that record in this appeal. The motion is denied. (SC)19-12548
04/22/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-17607
06/05/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC).