Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77511
Short Caption:REPUBLICAN ATTORNEYS GEN. ASS'N VS. LAS VEGAS METRO. POLICE DEP'TCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77131, 77219
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A780538Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/30/2018 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:12/12/2019 at 3:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:12/12/2019How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/28/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Clark Hill. Check no. 17000039. (SC)
11/28/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)18-906066
11/28/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)18-906068
11/30/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (SC)18-906426
12/10/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC).18-907792
12/11/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).18-908052
12/18/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)18-909328
12/20/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/05/18 and 10/17/18. To Court Reporter: Sharon Nicholas.18-909635
03/12/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-10884
03/12/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-10888
03/12/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2. (SC)19-10889
03/12/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3. (SC)19-10890
03/12/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4 Part 1. (SC)19-10891
03/12/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4 Part 2. (SC).19-10921
03/18/2019BriefFiled Appellant Republican Attorneys General Association's Amended Opening Brief. (SC)19-11965
04/10/2019BriefFiled Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department's Answering Brief. (SC)19-15546
05/10/2019BriefFiled Appellant Republican Attorneys General Association's Reply Brief. (SC)19-20627
05/13/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
09/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Exhibit. We direct the clerk of the district court to transmit the following exhibit within 14 days from the date of this order: Court's Exhibit 1, which is described as two CD discs. (SC)19-39860
10/03/2019ExhibitFiled Exhibit (Original). Exhibit: 1. (SC)
11/07/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on December 12, 2019 at 3:30 pm. (SC)19-45885
11/27/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-48507
12/04/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation of Counsel. (SC)19-49177
12/12/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/AS. (SC)
02/20/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Hardesty/Silver. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 3. SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)20-06932
03/19/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-10785
03/19/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)