Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77529
Short Caption:GATHRITE (DEANDRE) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77081, 77081-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C334135Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:07/19/2019 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:07/19/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/30/2018Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
11/30/2018Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition Directing the Honorable Douglas Herndon to Dismiss the Case Against the Petitioner. (SC)18-906355
11/30/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)18-906357
11/30/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)18-906358
11/30/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC)18-906359
12/07/2018MotionFiled Motion of Nevada Atorneys for Criminal Justice (NACJ) for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in support of Petitioner and Dismissal of the Indictment Against Him. (SC)18-907544
01/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the amicus brief received on December 7, 2018. (SC).19-01947
01/14/2019BriefFiled Amicus Brief of Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice (NACJ) in Support of Petitioner and Dismissal of the Indictment Against Him. (SC).19-01948
01/17/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Having reviewed the petition, we have determined that an answer would assist this court in resolving the petition. According, the real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. (SC)19-02845
01/31/2019Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition and Mandamus. (SC)19-04767
02/19/2019MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion For Leave to File Reply Brief to State's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition and Mandamus. (SC)19-07690
02/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply received on February 19, 2019. (SC).19-08574
02/25/2019Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply In Support of Petition For Writ of Prohibition and Mandamus to Dismiss the Case Against Petitioner. (SC).19-08575
06/03/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Friday, July 19, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC)19-23990
07/03/2019BriefFiled Petitioner Deandre Gathrite's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC).19-28631
07/08/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-28914
07/19/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/AS (SC)
11/07/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted in part and denied in part." Before Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Hardesty/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 54. SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)19-45722
11/07/2019WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and two copies of writ and two copies of the order mailed to Attorney Adrian M. Lobo for service upon Judge Douglas W. Herndon. (SC)19-45765
11/19/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Real Party in Interest's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)Y19-47282
11/20/2019WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Douglas Herndon on November 12, 2019. (SC).19-47576