Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77530
Short Caption:PAMPLIN (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77530-COA, 79933, 80512
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A779247Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:CadishCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/12/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/30/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
11/30/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)18-906399
12/26/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order. District Court Order due: 60 days. (SC)18-910277
01/09/2019OtherJustice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
01/16/2019Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on January 15, 2019. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. (SC)19-02436
01/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)19-04047
02/05/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-05586
02/19/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC).19-07565
02/19/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 1. (SC).19-07566
02/19/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - VOL 2. (SC).19-07567
02/22/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Change of Address (John Pamplin). (SC).19-08277
02/25/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (PSI) pages 51 thru 142 (SEALED). (SC)
02/25/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 158 to 162 (SEALED). (SC)
04/01/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion Requesting Judicial Notice. (SC)19-14240
04/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting this court take judicial notice. The motion is denied. (SC).19-15967
06/12/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC).
07/03/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion Pursuant to FRCP 60(B) 3-4-6, A Void Judgment Base Upon Fraud and Structure Error on the Court is Without Jurisdiction. (SC)19-28526
07/30/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (SC)19-32061
08/07/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting the appointment of appellate counsel. The motion is denied. (SC).19-33169
09/12/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC)19-38233
09/12/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC)
10/16/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2 [We have reviewed all documents Pamplin has filed in this matter, and we conclude no relief based upon those submissions is warranted. To the extent Pamplin has attempted to present claims or facts in those submissions which were not previously presented in the proceedings below, we decline to consider them in the first instance.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. (SC).
11/14/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
11/14/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-46702
11/14/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
12/06/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 19, 2019. (SC)19-46702