Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77535
Short Caption:DIXON (STEVEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CR 18-6963Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/30/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
11/30/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal. (Fast Track Notice issued to counsel for appellant.) (SC)18-906428
11/30/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)18-906431
12/04/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 09/19/18 and 09/20/18. Court Reporter: Leslie Rosenthal.18-906954
12/28/2018Fast Track BriefFiled Appellant's Fast Track Statement. (SC)18-910771
12/28/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volume 1. (SC)18-910773
01/14/2019Fast Track BriefFiled Respondent's Fast Track Response. (SC)19-02083
02/04/2019Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed. No fast track reply filed. (SC)
05/15/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Full Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief due: 30 days. (SC).19-21284
06/03/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-24028
06/28/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-27876
06/28/2019AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume One. (SC)19-27878
06/28/2019AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume Two. (SC)19-27879
08/12/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC)
12/22/2020OtherReturned Unfiled Document Letter (Sheila Swearingen). (SC)20-46246
05/06/2021Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Cadish/Pickering/Herndon. Author: Cadish, J. Majority: Cadish/Pickering/Herndon. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 19. NNP21-EC/KP/DH. (SC).21-12960
06/01/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-15480
06/01/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
06/18/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2021. (SC)21-15480