Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77587
Short Caption:PUNDYK (EDWARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR161290Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/27/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/06/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
12/06/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)18-907265
12/10/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)18-907768
01/16/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Judith Ann Schonlau stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/16/18, 7/17/18, 7/18/18, 7/19/18, 7/20/18, 7/23/18, 7/24/18, 7/25/18, 11/2/18. (SC)19-02545
04/05/2019MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-14847
04/05/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 6, 2019. (SC)19-14864
05/05/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief and Joint Appendix. (SC)19-19661
05/28/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 5, 2019. (SC).19-22923
06/05/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief and Joint Appendix. (SC)19-24327
06/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until July 5, 2019, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)19-25790
07/05/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC).19-28652
07/05/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume One. (SC).19-28653
07/05/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Two. (SC).19-28654
07/05/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Three. (SC).19-28656
07/05/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Four. (SC).19-28657
07/05/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Five. (SC).19-28658
07/05/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Six. (SC).19-28660
07/05/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Seven. (SC).19-28661
07/05/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Eight. (SC).19-28662
07/05/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume Nine. (SC).19-28664
08/05/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: August 19, 2019. (SC)19-32794
08/19/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-34761
09/17/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-38806
09/18/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).20-11756
07/16/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and Remanded." Before: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Cadish. Author: Cadish, J. Majority: Cadish/Parraguirre/Hardesty. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 43. NNP20-RP/JH/EC. (SC)20-26092