Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77622
Short Caption:HIGH DESERT STATE PRISON VS. SANCHEZ (LUIS)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A775677Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/13/2019How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/11/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
12/11/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)18-908131
12/24/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)18-910110
12/27/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)18-910554
01/08/2019OtherReturned Unfiled Document "Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief."19-01075
04/09/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 24, 2019. (SC).19-15476
04/11/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney (Substitution of Attorneys) (Natasha Mary Gebrael in place of Heidi Parry Stern and Ashley Alexandria Balducci for Appellants). (SC)19-15907
04/24/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC)19-18066
04/24/2019AppendixFiled Appellants' Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)19-18074
04/24/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 04/25/19). (SC)
04/25/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Appellants' Opening Brief). (SC)19-18142
05/14/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Informal Brief (Answering Brief). (SC).19-21057
06/13/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-25587
06/13/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)