Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77646
Short Caption:FRANKLIN (TERON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77646-COA
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC-1807059Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Transferred to Court of Appeals
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/12/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/12/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
12/12/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)18-908374
12/18/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC).18-909325
12/20/2018Letter/IncomingFiled Letter to the Clerk of the Court - Regarding Respondent's Counsel. (SC)18-909839
01/03/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1. (SC)
01/09/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney Michael Bongard, who is listed as counsel of record for respondent on this court's docket, has filed a letter asking to be removed as counsel of record and stating that he will file a notice of appearance if requested. We decline to remove Mr. Bongard as counsel of record at this time. (SC)19-01396
04/25/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-18204
06/12/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
09/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).19-39151
09/19/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).