Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 77652
Short Caption:SNODGRASS VS. BANGO OIL, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1502362Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/17/2018 / Yott, LaurieSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:05/12/2021 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/12/2021How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/13/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Bradley Paul Elley. Check no. 1186. (SC)
12/13/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)18-908472
12/13/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)18-908474
12/17/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Laure A. Yott. (SC)18-909098
01/03/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-00293
01/17/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 27, 2019, at 9:00 am. (SC).19-02751
04/09/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. This case has been reset for June 13, 2019, at 10:00 am. (SC).19-15323
06/11/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Daniel F. Polsenberg, Joel D. Henriod and Abraham G. Smith of Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP hereby appear, in association with Bradley Paul Elley, as attorneys for appellant Daniel Snodgrass. (SC)19-25348
06/14/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: TBD. The parties are still actively discussing settlement. I anticipate another conference. Settlement Judge respectfully requests a 30 day extension. (SC).19-25767
06/26/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The settlement judge shall file the Final Settlement Program Status Report by July 29, 2019. (SC)19-27421
07/09/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).19-29203
07/11/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).19-29435
07/25/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/15/18. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services. (SC)19-31597
09/27/2019TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Erin T. Terretto stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/15/18. (SC)19-40318
10/09/2019MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC).19-41801
10/09/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 8, 2019. (SC).19-41808
11/08/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-46131
11/21/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 9, 2019. (SC).19-47682
12/09/2019MotionFiled Motion for Extension To File Opening Brief. (SC)19-49891
12/19/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 9, 2020. (SC).19-51383
01/09/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension To File Opening Brief. (SC)20-01186
01/10/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion for Extension for Opening Brief. (SC)20-01285
01/16/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until February 10, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)20-02118
02/10/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-05595
02/14/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 18, 2020. (SC)20-06336
02/18/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. (SC)20-06699
02/18/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2, Part 1. (SC)20-06701
02/18/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2, Part 2. (SC)20-06702
02/18/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3. (SC)20-06704
02/18/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4. (SC)20-06705
02/18/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5. (SC)20-06706
02/18/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Addendum to Opening Brief - Appellant's NRAP 28(f) Pamphlet with Legislative History of Amendments to NRS Chapter 459. (SC)20-06730
02/18/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-06731
03/11/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Brief (First Request). (SC)20-09671
03/12/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief Due: April 20, 2020. (SC)20-09752
04/14/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time for Answering Brief (Second Request). (SC)20-14020
04/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until May 20, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)20-15403
05/20/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-19267
05/20/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Addendum to Answering Brief. (SC)20-19273
06/19/2020MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC)20-22949
06/22/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: July 20, 2020. (SC)20-23003
07/20/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC)20-26500
07/31/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until August 19, 2020, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC)20-28054
08/19/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)20-30674
08/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion requesting a third extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. Reply brief due: September 18, 2020. (SC)20-31684
09/18/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)20-34543
09/23/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until October 19, 2020, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC)20-35036
10/19/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)20-38318
10/28/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief due: November 18, 2020. (SC)20-39456
11/18/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC)20-42222
11/19/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion for Extension of Time. (SC)20-42272
11/19/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC).20-42412
11/30/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Reply to Response on Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC)20-43368
12/01/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for a sixth extension of time to file the reply brief. The motion is granted. The reply brief was filed on November 19, 2020. (SC)20-43417
12/01/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/01/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on May 12, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The argument will be videoconferenced. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system. Within 7 days of the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the phone number and email address of the attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (SC)21-09480
04/27/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC)21-12001
04/28/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)21-12120
04/28/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Authorities NRAP 31(e). (SC)21-12252
05/03/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (J. Robert Smith) (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 05/04/21). (SC)
05/04/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance. (Matthew B. Hippler). (SC)21-12696
05/07/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Matthew B. Hippler. (SC)21-13143
05/07/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Withdrawal of Law Firm Holland & Hart, LLP. (SC)21-13155
05/12/2021Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. 77652. (NNP21-EC/KP/DH) (SC).
05/17/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall remove the law firm of Holland & Hart as counsel for respondent. Respondent remains represented by the law firms Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg and Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP. (SC)21-14160
07/23/2021Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-21286
08/10/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-23289
08/23/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: September 10, 2021. (SC)21-24469
09/01/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Micah S. Echols, Esq. of Claggett & Sykes Law Firm and Matthew L. Sharp of the Law Office of Matthew L. Sharp, hereby notify this Court of their appearance on behalf of proposed amicus curiae Nevada Justice Association. (In Support of Appellant) (SC)21-25495
09/10/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-26327
09/21/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's petition for rehearing due: October 11, 2021. (SC)21-27253
10/11/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)Y21-29180
10/11/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Daniel F. Polsenberg. (SC)
10/13/2021MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief of the Nevada Justice Association. (First Request) (SC)21-29398
10/21/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time to file a motion for leave to file an amicus brief in support of appellant is granted. Counsel for the Nevada Justice Association shall have until November 17, 2021, to file the motion accompanied by the proposed brief. (SC)21-30307