Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0536
Short Caption:IN RE: AMENDMENTS TO JUSTICE COURT RULES OF PAHRUMPCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Petition Filed
Filed Date:12/13/2018Public Hearing:
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/13/2018Administrative CaseFiled Petition to Amend the Justice Court Rules of the Pahrump Justice Court.18-908519
03/07/2019Administrative CaseFiled Petition to Adopt the Justice Court Local Rules for the Pahrump Justice Court, by Creating PJC Rules 1 through 14.19-10244
01/30/2020Administrative CaseFiled Petition to Adopt the Justice Court Local Rules for the Pahrump Justice Court, by Creating PJC Rules 1 Through 50.20-04117
04/14/2020Administrative CaseFiled Amended Petition to Adopt the Justice Court Local Rules for the Pahrump Justice Court, by Creating PJC Rules 1 Through 50.20-14034
05/26/2020Administrative CaseFiled Order Approving Rules of Practice for the Pahrump Justice Court.20-19772
08/25/2020Administrative CaseA Clean Copy of Exhibit A, Adoption of the Local Rules of Practice for the Justice Court of Pahrump Township.20-31294