Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77697
Short Caption:VOSS (STEVEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):32830, 54033, 61958, 62024, 62746, 66508, 66508-COA, 69900, 69900-COA, 70584, 73468, 73468-COA, 75030, 75030-COA, 75471, 76211, 76211-COA, 76826
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR972077Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/22/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/19/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
12/19/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)18-909478
01/08/2019BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)19-00985
01/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant has filed an informal brief. Respondent need not file a response to the brief unless ordered to do so by this court. (SC)19-02034
01/17/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-17 (Via FTP). (SC)19-02757
01/17/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 18-34 (Via FTP). (SC)19-02788
01/18/2019Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volume 35 (SEALED). (SC)
01/18/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Presentence Investigation Report (SEALED). (SC)
02/22/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)