Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0537
Short Caption:IN RE: SUPREME COURT ACCESS TO JUSTICE COMMISSIONCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Scheduled for Hearing
Filed Date:12/20/2018Public Hearing:
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/20/2018Administrative CaseFiled Petition.18-909650
01/14/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Supreme Court Rule 15. Exhibit A attached. Effective 30 days from the date of this order.19-01892
01/14/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Co-Chairs to the Access to Justice Commission. Associate Chief Justice Kristina Pickering and Associate Justice James W. Hardesty are hereby appointed to serve as co-chairs of the Access to Justice Commission.19-01895
02/06/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Members to the Access to Justice Commission. Exhibit A attached.19-05789
02/20/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order Modifying Rule Amendment. We direct the clerk of this court to modify Exhibit A.19-07926
04/19/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Members. See Exhibit A for individuals appointed.19-17385
05/10/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Member to the Access to Justice Commission. Exhibit A attached.19-20556
07/05/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order Appointing Members to the Access to Justice Commission. Exhibit A attached.19-28696
07/23/2019Administrative CaseFiled Petition.19-31033
08/05/2019Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. Exhibit A attached. Hearing to be held Thursday, September 5, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in the Supreme Court Courtroom in Carson City. Videoconferenced to the Supreme Court Courtroom in Las Vegas. Comments may be submitted electronically or in hard-copy format due to the Clerk by 5 p.m. on August 27, 2019. Persons interested in participating must notify the Clerk no later than August 27, 2019.19-32885