Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77704
Short Caption:STATE, DEP'T OF CORR. VS. DEROSACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 18OC001501BClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/21/2018 / Wasick, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/27/2020How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/20/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality. (SC)
12/20/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)18-909714
12/20/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)18-909716
12/21/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick. (SC).18-909891
01/04/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-00487
01/07/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 18, 2019, at 10:00 am. (SC).19-00934
01/07/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 28, 2019 at 10:00 am. (SC).19-00927
03/04/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Amended ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC).19-09685
03/06/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).19-10021
03/15/2019Transcript RequestFiled Certificate That No Transcript Is Being Requested. (SC)19-11679
06/04/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 18, 2019. (SC).19-24098
06/18/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief and Joint Appendix Volume 1 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 06/18/19). (SC)
06/18/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Opening Brief and Joint Appendix due: 5 days. (SC)19-26400
06/19/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-26420
06/19/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1. (SC)19-26421
07/12/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Answering Brief due: August 2, 2019. (SC).19-29826
08/02/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-32672
08/28/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: September 17, 2019. (SC)19-35995
09/11/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time (Reply Brief). (SC)19-37958
09/12/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time (Reply Brief). (SC)19-38155
09/23/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: October 17, 2019. (SC).19-39524
10/17/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC).19-43128
10/18/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC).
01/30/2020MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Respondent Patricia DeRosa. (SC)20-04159
02/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall remove attorney Thomas J. Donaldson, Sue S. Matuska, and Dyer Lawrence, LLP from the docket in this appeal. Respondent's Notice of Appearance due: 30 days. (SC).20-06113
03/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).20-11757
04/01/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC).20-12463
07/09/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Cadish. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Cadish. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 37. NNP20-RP/JH/EC. (SC)20-25290
07/21/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries. (SC)20-26507
08/03/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-28213
08/03/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)