Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77722
Short Caption:WILSON, P.E. VS. PAHRUMP FAIR WATER, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV39524Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/To Screening
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/21/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality. (SC)
12/21/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)18-909994
12/21/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)18-909997
12/24/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC).18-910192
01/02/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) For Stay of District Court's Order Granting Petition for Judicial Review Pending Appeal Pursuant to NRAP 8(a)(2) and Request for Administrative Stay Pending Decision on Underlying Motion for Stay. (SC)19-00237
01/03/2019Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-00261
01/03/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Temporary Stay and Directing Expedited Response. We stay enforcement of the district court's December 6, 2018, order granting judicial review and reversing State Engineer Order 1293A, pending further order of this court. Respondents shall have until 4:00 p.m. on January 9, 2019, to file and serve a response to the motion for stay. Respondents' response shall be filed personally or by facsimile or electronic transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City. No extensions of time will be granted. (SC).19-00385
01/03/2019Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/08/18. To Court Reporter: Deborah Ann Hines. (SC)19-00411
01/09/2019MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition To Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(E) For Stay Of District Court's Order Granting Petition For Judicial Review Pending Appeal Pursuant To NRAP 8(A)(2) And Request For Administrative Stay Pending Decision on Underlying Motion for Stay. (SC)19-01311
01/10/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of State Engineer's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay of District Court's Order Granting Petition for Judicial Review Pending Appeal Pursuant to NRAP 8(a)(2). (SC)19-01594
01/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Stay and Expediting Appeal. we grant appellant's motion and stay enforcement of the district court's December 6, 2018, order granting judicial review and reversing State Engineer Order 1293A, pending further order of this court. Appellant shall have until February 15, 2019, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall thereafter proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1), but no extensions of time will be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. (SC)19-01782
01/18/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Substitution of Appellant Jason King, Nevada State Engineer. (SC)19-02964
01/28/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Substitution. Pursuant to the motion of substitution filed on January 18, 2019, Tim Wilson, P.E., is substituted in this matter in place of Jason King, P.E., as Nevada State Engineer. The clerk shall amend the caption accordingly. (SC).19-04308
02/15/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. I. (SC)19-07462
02/15/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. II. (SC)19-07463
02/15/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. III. (SC)19-07464
02/19/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-07532
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. IV. (SC)19-07544
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. V. (SC)19-07545
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. VI. (SC)19-07547
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. VII. (SC)19-07549
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. VIII. (SC)19-07580
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. IX. (SC)19-07581
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. X. (SC)19-07588
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. XI. (SC)19-07595
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. XII. (SC)19-07612
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. XIII. (SC)19-07619
02/19/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Vol. XIV. (SC)19-07620
03/21/2019BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/22/19). (SC)
03/22/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Answering Brief due: 5 days. (SC)19-12767
03/22/2019MotionFiled Motion of the Nevada Groundwater Association and Water Systems Council for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Respondents. (SC)19-12814
03/22/2019MotionFiled Motion to Associate Counsel (Jesse J. Richardson Jr. for Amici Water Systems Council and the Nevada Groundwater Association). (SC)19-12816
03/26/2019BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)19-13403
03/28/2019BriefFiled Amicus Brief of the Nevada Groundwater Association and Water Sytems Council (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 03/28/19). (SC)
03/28/2019BriefFiled Amended Amicus Brief of the Nevada Groundwater Association and Water Systems Council (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 03/28/19). (SC)
03/28/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Amicus Brief due: 5 days. (SC)19-13856
03/29/2019BriefFiled Second Amended Amicus Brief of the Nevada Groundwater Association and Water Systems Council. (SC)19-13910
03/29/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Motion of the Nevada Groundwater Association and Water Systems Council for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Respondents. (SC)19-13986
04/04/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Nevada Groundwater Association and Water Systems Council have filed a motion for leave to file an amicus brief in support of respondents. Having reviewed the proposed brief and appellant's response, the motion is granted. The second amended amicus brief was filed on March 29, 2019. Amici have also filed a motion to associate attorney Jesse J. Richardson Jr., pursuant to SCR 42. Mr. Richardson shall be permitted to appear on behalf of amici curiae in this matter. Nevada attorney Gregory H. Morrison of Parsons Behle & Latimer shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Richardson in this appeal. (SC)19-14692
04/25/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-18320
04/26/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)