Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 76607-COA
Short Caption:CANTERBURY VS. U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE C/W 76523Court:Court of Appeals
Consolidated:76523-COA*, 76607-COARelated Case(s):76523, 76523-COA, 76604, 76606, 76607, 76608, 76609, 76633, 76633-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV38979Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Judge Bulla for Senior Justice DouglasPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/27/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. Nos. 76523/76607 (COA)
01/11/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Review and Clarification/Status of Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals. Nos. 76523/76607. (COA)19-01659
02/28/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The motion for appointment of counsel is denied, as no cause to appoint a pro bono attorney appears at this time. Further, appellant's request that we direct the district court to serve respondents goes to the merits of these appeals and will be addressed in the disposition; thus, no action is taken on that request at this time. Nos. 75623/76607. (COA19-09263
03/25/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2 [To the extent Canterbury has sought any further relief in this court, in light of this order, we deny any such requests as moot.]Court of Appeals- JT/MG/BB. Nos. 76523/76607.19-12962
04/19/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. Nos. 76523/76607 (COA)
04/19/2019Case Status UpdateCase Closed. Nos. 76523/76607 (COA)