Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 77753
Short Caption:MORGAN VS. LUJANCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):78596, 80837, 81975
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A718679Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/31/2018 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/27/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC)
12/27/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)18-910662
12/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)18-910664
12/28/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Marquis Aurbach Coffing. Check no. 125755. (SC)
12/31/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (SC).18-910922
01/15/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: January 30, 2019. (SC).19-02106
01/23/2019MotionFiled Respondent Harvest Management Sub LLC's Motion to Dismiss Appeal as Premature. (SC)19-03641
01/24/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for February 26, 2019, 10:00 am. (SC).19-03829
01/28/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Counsel (Micah Echols and Kathleen Wilde as counsel for Appellant. Tom Stewart is no longer associated with this case).19-04136
01/30/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Harvest Mgmt. Sub LLC's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss due: February 15, 2019. (SC)19-04709
01/31/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)19-04777
02/11/2019Docketing StatementFiled Respondent Harvest Management Sub LLC's Response to Docketing Statement. (SC)19-06396
02/19/2019MotionFiled Appellant Aaron Morgan's Response to Harvest Managment's Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Conditional Counter-Motion. (SC).19-07658
02/22/2019MotionFiled Respondent Harvest Management Sub LLC's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal as Premature; and Response to Appellant's Conditional Counter-Motion. (SC)19-08386
02/22/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Harvest Management Sub LLC's NRAP 26.1 Disclosure Statement. (SC)19-08398
03/07/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Dismiss. Respondent Harvest Management Sub, LLC, has filed a motion requesting this court dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. We deny the motion. This denial is without prejudice to respondent Harvest's right to renew the motion, if necessary, upon completion of settlement proceedings. fn1 [Appellant's conditional counter-motion to postpone or extend time for consideration of motion to dismiss, which Harvest opposes, is denied as moot.] (SC).19-10349
04/01/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 13, 2019, at 10:00 am. The Settlement Judge requests 90 days beyond deadline to submit final report. (SC).19-14183
04/08/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order. The settlement judge's recommendation that this appeal remain assigned to the settlement program for an additional 90 days is approved. The settlement judge shall file the Final Settlement Program Status Report by September 30, 2019. (SC)19-15070
05/15/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Remand Pursuant to NRAP 12A. (SC)19-21519
05/17/2019MotionFiled Respondent Harvest Management Sub LLC's Opposition to Motion for Remand Pursuant to NRAP 12A. (SC)19-21707
05/21/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply to Harvest Management Sub LLC's Opposition to Motion for Remand due: June 7, 2019. (SC)19-22243
06/07/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Remand Pursuant to NRAP 12A. (SC)19-24873
07/31/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for remand pursuant to NRAP 12A. The motion is denied. (SC).19-32288
08/19/2019Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC).19-34710
08/19/2019MotionFiled Respondent Harvest Management Sub LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal as Premature. (SC)19-34762
08/22/2019Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC).19-35241
08/26/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Harvest Management's Motion to Dismiss and Counter-Motion Renewing Request for Remand and Stay of Current Deadlines. (SC)19-35539
08/28/2019MotionFiled Respondent Harvest Management Sub LLC's Reply to Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal as Premature; and Response to Counter-Motion Renewing Request for Remand and Stay of Current Deadlines. (SC)19-36008
09/06/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. I believe that I can be fair and impartial in this case, but with the law firm of Marquis Aurbach Coffing representing appellant, I wish to disclose that Phillip Aurbach, Esq., is a member of my Red Rock summer mixed tennis team. The parties will have 10 days from the date of this order to file any objection based on my disclosure. (SC).19-37338
09/17/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[Harvest's request that this court direct the district court to enter judgment in its favor is denied. SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)19-38787
10/14/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-42345
10/14/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
11/05/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 18, 2019. (SC)19-42345